judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WARD VS. WARD

Case Information: 33470
Short Caption:WARD VS. WARDCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38555
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D214084
Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D214705
Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Child Custody
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/23/1998 / Kummer, ThomasSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/22/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
12/14/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Gayle Nathan--check no. 2909.
12/14/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 98-00370
12/23/1998Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Thomas F. Kummer . (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/23/1998Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 98-00495
01/11/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Copy of letter to counsel from Settlement Judge Kummer. 99-00148
02/02/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Copy of letter to counsel from Settlement Judge Kummer. The settlement conference has been rescheduled to 2/24/99. 99-00715
04/12/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 13, 1999. 99-02753
05/07/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: May 20, 1999. 99-03660
07/02/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-05816
07/23/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with provisions of NRAP 9(a). Because this is a child custody matter, appellant shall have 90 days to file opening brief and appendix. Respondent shall have 20 days after service of the opening brief to file and serve the answering brief. Appellant shall have 10 days after service of the answering brief to file and serve the reply brief. NRAP 31(a)(2). 99-06651
08/09/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: 9/10/98. To Court Reporter: Theodora M. Law. 99-07316
09/07/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: Non-Jury Trial Thursday, September 10, 1998. Court Reporter: Deborah S. Casper. 99-08393
10/20/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 99-10258
10/20/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. Returned unfiled the original and one copy of the opening brief.
10/27/1999MotionFiled Motion. Appellant's Motion to Consider Events Outside the Pleadings and Paper on File Below. 99-10517
10/27/1999Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Amended Certificate of Mailing for Appellant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief, Appellant's Brief, and Appellant's Motion to Consider Events Outside the Pleadings and Paper on File. 99-10519
10/27/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Appellant's Motion for an Extenson of Time to File Brief (First Request). 99-10515
11/23/1999MotionFiled Motion. Notice of Non-Opposition to Appellant's Motion for an Extesnion of Time to File Brief and Stipulation to Extend Time to File Answering Brief. 99-11702
02/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We deny appellant's motion to consider events outside of the pleadings and papers on file below. In taking this matter under consideration, this court shall disregard all inappropriate references to materials outside the district court record. On October 27, 1999, appellant also filed a motion for an extension of time to file the opening brief. On November 23, 1999, respondent file a notice of non-opposition. We grant the motion and approve the stipulation. The clerk shall forthwith file the opening brief provisionally received on October 27, 1999. Respondent shall, within 30 days of the date of this order, file and serve the answering brief. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(2). 00-02721
02/22/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed-Ex 10/26/99. 99-10516
03/21/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 00-04481
03/23/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. for Motion to Extend Time/Answering Brief. "MISSING." 00-04649
03/29/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. Respondent's answering brief shall be served and filed on or before April 4, 2000. 00-05028
04/05/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 4/4/00. 00-05458
04/05/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 00-05460
04/17/2000Other Returned Unfiled Document. Appellant's Reply Brief.
04/27/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 4/25/00. 00-06874
05/01/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. for appellant's reply brief. 00-07063
11/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Southern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. 00-20544
11/22/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. SNP00A-1 (CY/RR/NB).
12/11/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Dispositional Order/Appeal. Order of Reversal and Remand. fn2[Having considered Tiffany's argument, we disagree with her contention and conclude that the parties should be responsible for their own attorney's fees.] Because it appears from the record that the district court may have made an unequal division of the community property and debt, " . . . we remand the case to the district court to enter specific findings of fact in support of its division of the community property and debt and, as required by NRS 125.150(1)(b), to set forth in writing the compelling reasons for making an unequal disposition of community property and debt in this case." The parties are responsible for their own attorney's fees and costs incurred during this appeal. SNP00A-1-RR/CY/NB 00-21562
01/08/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-21806
01/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
02/20/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2001. 00-21806