judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SANDRA STERANKO v. DANIELLE DUNKS

Case Heading (S-09-0008)
Case Number:S-09-0008Case Docketed On:01/12/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief
Short Title:SANDRA STERANKO v. DANIELLE DUNKS
Full Title:SANDRA STERANKO, Petitioner, v. DANIELLE DUNKS, Respondent.

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
PetitionerSandra SterankoMatthew David Winslow
RespondentDanielle DunksTimothy W. Miller

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Civil Procedure
Opinion Number:2009 WY 9
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/12/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/12/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/12/2009Petition - Writ - reviewPetitionWrit - reviewFinal
01/12/2009Motion - Stay - otherMotionStay - otherFinal
01/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Petitioner's motion to stay district court proceedings; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/22/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - received Response to Petition for Writ of Review and Response to Motion to Stay District Court Proceedings. Called counsel and advised that pleadings must be e-filed. Also, requested original copy of Response to PetitionNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
01/23/2009Petition - Other - Supplement to Petition for Writ of ReviewPetitionOtherFinal
01/27/2009Response to petition for writ of view (attachments on response). Title of document submitted through system says "Brief of Appellee." Wrong docket entry chosen for submittal.BriefAppelleeFinal
01/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Filed Response to PetitionEventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/28/2009Event - Rejected Filing - response to motion to stay - untimely.EventRejected FilingFinal
01/28/2009Response/Objection - MotionResponse/ObjectionMotionFinal
01/28/2009Event - Phone Call - received call from Mr. Miller's office questioning timeliness of response to motion to stay. The 3 days for service by mail were not calculated, and the response would be timely if filed by the 1/30/09. Asked counsel to resubmit response for filing.EventPhone CallFinal
01/29/2009Order - Petition for review - grantOrderPetition for review - grantFinal
01/29/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal