judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

IN RE: KEITH J. SMITH

Case Information: 10-BG-1479
Short Caption:IN RE: KEITH J. SMITHClassification:Bar Governance - Bar - Disciplinary Original
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:BDN339-03, ET ALFiled Date:11/22/2010

Opening Event Date:11/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/08/2011
Argued/Submitted:03/07/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
PetitionerBar CounselN
Wallace E. Shipp NN
Joseph N. BowmanYY
PetitionerBoard on Professional ResponsibilityN
Charles J. WilloughbyNN
RespondentKeith J. Smith NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/22/2010REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF BOARD ON PROF. RESP. that respondent be disbarred. The Board further recommend that the period of disbarment run for purposes of reinstatement from the filing of the affidavit required by D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14 (g).
12/03/2010ORDER On consideration of the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility that the court disbar respondent from the practice of law in the District of Columbia and that the period of disbarment run for purposes of reinstatement from the filing of the affidavit required by D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 (g), it is ORDERED that respondent show cause within thirty days why the court should not enter an order of suspension pending final action on the Board on Professional Responsibility's recommendation. It is FURTHER ORDERED that respondent's attention is drawn to the requirement of Rule XI, Sec 14 relating to suspended attorneys and to the provisions of Rule XI, Sec 16 (c) dealing with the timing of eligibility for reinstatement as related to compliance with Rule XI, Sec 14, including the filing of the required affidavit. (ETW)
12/13/2010LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel taking no exception to the report and recommendation of the Board on Professional Responsibility.
12/13/2010RESPONDENT'S EXCEPTIONS
12/14/2010ORDER On consideration of the exceptions of respondent, filed in response to the Board on Professional Responsibility's report and recommendation filed on November 22, 2010, it is ORDERED that the brief of respondent (an original and three copies) shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and the brief of Bar Counsel shall be filed within 30 days thereafter
01/03/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Respondent)
01/12/2011RECEIVED from respondent an amended certificate of service for respondent's exceptions, and an amended certificate of service of respondent's response.
01/20/2011RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF (Unopposed)
01/28/2011ORDER On consideration of respondent's unopposed motion to enlarge time within which to file responsive brief, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and respondent's brief shall be filed fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. (JC)
01/28/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF
02/04/2011TMC - OTSC - ROTSC
02/07/2011RECEIVED respondent's supplemental brief.
02/09/2011ORDER On consideration of the Board on Professional Responsibility's report and recommendation, this court's order directing respondent to show cause why he should not be suspended pending final action on the Board's report and the response of respondent. it is ORDERED that respondent is hereby suspended from the practice of law in the District of Columbia ending final action on this matter. See D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 9 (g)(2)(a). (GL,TH,TE)
02/15/2011RECEIVED amended certificates of service for respondent's brief and supplemental brief.
02/16/2011RESPONDENT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to file the lodged supplemental brief.
02/17/2011ORDER On consideration of respondent's motion for leave to file the lodged supplemental brief, and the response of Joseph Bowman, Assistant Bar Counsel, that Bar Counsel does not object to the granting of respondent's motion, it is ORDERED that respondent's motion is granted and respondent's supplemental brief is hereby filed. (JC)
02/17/2011RESPONDENT'S BRIEF (Supplemental)
02/25/2011AFFIDAVIT of respondent
02/25/2011RECEIVED address for respondent: 705 4th Street, NW, #108, Washington, D.C. 20001
03/07/2011PETITIONER'S BRIEF (Bar Counsel)
03/08/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
03/08/2011FINAL SCREENING - REGULAR CALENDAR
03/08/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel a copy of the Hearing Committee's Findings of Fact Conclusion of Law and Recommendation as to sanction, filed with the Board on February 24, 2010. To be attached to Bar Counsel's brief.
03/29/2011RECEIVED motion for pro hac vice to permit Tony Sangiamo, Esquire, to represent respondent, Keith Smith, Esquire, in his appeal from disciplinary actions nunc pro tunc. *Motion returned to S. Shiva Arati, Esquire. Failed to go thru the Committee on Admissions and pay the fee ($100).
04/07/2011RESPONDENT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION (consent) for pro hac vice to permit Tony Sangiamo to represent respondent in his appeal from disciplinary actions nunc pro tunc.
04/14/2011ORDER On consideration of the motion of S. Shiva Arati, Esquire, requesting that the appearance of Tony Sangiamo, Esquire, be entered pro hac vice on behalf of Keith J. Smith, nunc pro tunc to December 13, 2010, it is ORDERED that the motion of S. Shiva Arati, Esquire, is granted and the Clerk shall enter the appearance of Tony Sangiamo, Esquire, pro hac vice on behalf of Keith J. Smith, nunc pro tunc to December 13, 2010. (ETW)
04/14/2011APPEARANCE of Tony Sangiamo, Esquire, 39 South Duke Street, P.O. Box 1324, York, PA 17405, as attorney for respondent.
04/27/2011RECEIVED from the Office of Bar Counsel an amended certificate of service for Bar Counsel's brief on March 23, 2011.
06/01/2011LETTER from the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court that respondent has failed to file an affidavit in compliance with D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14.
01/09/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
01/31/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
03/01/2013FiledCounsel's Motion To Withdraw as counsel. (Respondent)Granted
03/07/2013FiledOrder Granting respondent's counsel Tony Sangiamo, Esq. to withdraw.
03/07/2013FiledSubmitted to Judges Thompson, McLeese, Ruiz
03/08/2013FiledLetter From the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court of respondent's address and phone number: 7316 Flower Avenue, Apt. #2, Silver Spring, MD 20912-6429 and phone 202 903-7673. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
03/08/2013FiledLetter From the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court that respondent has failed to file the required affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
03/13/2013FiledOrder To Show Cause why appeal should not be submitted
03/15/2013FiledChange Of Address Received From respondent. (Respondent)
03/27/2013FiledResponse To Order To Show Cause that the court should reset the date for oral argument. (Respondent)
04/02/2013FiledAnswer/Response to respondent's response to this court's order to show cause. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
05/01/2013FiledOrder Sua Sponte submitting this matter for decision.
07/25/2013FiledDisbarment. (TH,ML,RZ)
09/12/2013FiledLetter From the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court that respondent has failed to file a compliant affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)
09/13/2013FiledAffidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar R. XI, Sec 14. (Respondent)
10/30/2013FiledLetter From the Office of Bar Counsel advising the court that respondent's affidavit pursuant to D.C. Bar Rule XI, Sec 14 does not comply with the Rules. (Petitioner Bar Counsel)