judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00873-CR
14-89-00873-CR
09/20/1989
Other Drug Possession
Cole, Benny
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/29/1989Case stored
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
12/21/1989Mandate Issued
12/07/1989Motion to withdraw appeal DISPOSED - ANT,APEGRANTED
12/07/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
12/07/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
12/06/1989Submitted
12/06/1989Submission
12/06/1989Submitted
12/01/1989Motion to withdraw appeal FILED
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/19/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
09/15/1989Motion for new trial FILED
08/30/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/29/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJames D. Hurst
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasFranklin Blazek
Trial Court Information
278th District Court
Walker
Honorable JERRY A. SANDEL
15,453-C
10 years TDC