judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00238-CR
12-89-00238-CR
09/20/1989
Other Drug Possession
Mann, Willie
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/08/1991
07/02/1991Mandate Issued
06/17/1991
06/03/1991
05/17/1991Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
05/17/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/25/1991Submitted
04/25/1991Submission
04/02/1991Submission
03/05/1990
02/28/1990Brief Filed
02/28/1990Case ready to be set
02/14/1990Brief Filed
02/02/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/02/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/15/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/21/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/21/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
12/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/17/1989Motion or Writ Granted
11/17/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
11/14/1989
11/14/1989
11/06/1989motion for extension of time to file sfacts
10/26/1989Letter from the Court
10/23/1989motion for extension of time to file sfacts
10/11/1989No Description Available.
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/05/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/30/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/05/2016RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
07/08/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mann, WillieCriminal - AppellantMr. Clifton L. Holmes
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasMs. C. Patrice Savage
Trial Court Information
124th District Court
Gregg
Honorable Donald R. Ross
17,161-B
30 yrs. TDC