judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00237-CR
12-89-00237-CR
09/20/1989
Robbery
Rose, Jerrell
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/09/1990
07/03/1990Mandate Issued
06/18/1990
06/01/1990
05/17/1990No Description Available.Affirmed
05/17/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
05/10/1990Submitted
05/10/1990Submission
05/03/1990
02/26/1990Case ready to be set
02/26/1990
02/02/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/02/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/31/1990Brief Filed
01/31/1990Brief Received
01/17/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/18/1989
11/30/1989Motion or Writ Granted
11/30/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
11/20/1989motion for extension of time to file sfacts
11/10/1989Letter from the Court
10/13/1989No Description Available.
09/22/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/30/1989Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/03/1990RetentionCriminal case to be retained permanently (sentence over 20 years or historical value)
07/09/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jerrell, RoseCriminal - Appellant
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
124th District Court
Gregg
Honorable Donald R. Ross
17,435-B
20 yrs. TDC