judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1279-89
PD-1279-89
09/20/1989
PDR Case Type
LINDLEY, JUDY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
10/12/1989RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/31/1990FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
01/31/1990REHEAR DISPDENIED
12/21/1989REHEAR FILED
12/06/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/12/1989RESPONSE FILED
09/20/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/02/1990STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateDavid Brabham
LINDLEY, JUDYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Clifton L. Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
12-88-00003-CR
Aff 5-19-89
12th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
188th District Court
Gregg
Honorable LARRY STARR
15,633-A