judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-1278-89
PD-1278-89
09/20/1989
PDR Case Type
STEVENSON, JERRY O''NEAL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/20/1989FINAL DISP/REHEARRefused
12/20/1989REHEAR DISPDENIED
12/05/1989REHEAR FILED
11/22/1989PDR DISPRefused
10/24/1989NO RESPONSE FILED
09/20/1989PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/22/1989STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
STATE OF TEXASStateBilly Bandy
STEVENSON, JERRY O''NEALApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Rex Kirby
Court of Appeals Information:
12-88-00119-CR
Rev & Rem 8-18-89
12th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
173rd District Court
Henderson
A-4057