judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-9072
C-9072
09/20/1989
App Writ of Error
DEBBY WAYNE ROBERTSON
JESSIE JAMES BROWN AND ETTA MAE BROWN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
11/09/1989Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/06/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent
09/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
12/01/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
11/29/1989Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
11/16/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
11/09/1989Motion for Rehearing
10/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
10/12/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/12/1989No description available.
10/06/1989Reply to Response
09/20/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/01/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
03-88-00189-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 90, 06-14-89
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable JIMMY CARROLL
Trial Court Information
Bastrop County Court
Bastrop
86 232 CCL