judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 12-89-00240-CV
12-89-00240-CV
09/20/1989
Mandamus
Avemco Insurance Company & Loss Management Services, Inc.
Ross, Hon. Donald R., Judge, 4th District Court
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/27/2002Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
02/20/1990
02/05/1990
01/19/1990Motion to dismiss disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/19/1990No Description Available.Dismissed
01/19/1990Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
01/19/1990Submission
01/19/1990Submitted
12/13/1989Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
11/07/1989Case ready to be set
11/06/1989Disposition of MotionAbated
11/06/1989Response to Motion Filed
11/06/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
11/06/1989No Description Available.
10/27/1989Notice of judgment or order entered by Court
10/27/1989Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Motion for Leave to FileMotion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Submission
10/12/1989Motion for Leave to File
10/12/1989Response to Motion Filed
10/09/1989Response to Motion Filed
10/09/1989Response to Motion Filed
09/28/1989Letter from the Court
09/20/1989
09/20/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/20/1989Exhibits received
09/20/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/27/2002Case DestroyedCase Destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
4th District Court
Rusk
Honorable Donald R. Ross
87-08-377