judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM P. RICE v. COLLINS COMMUNICATION, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, CAMPBELL COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, CAMPBELL COUNTY SHERIFF, WILLIAM POWNALL, GILLETTE/WRIGHT/CAMPBELL COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION JOINT POWERS BOARD, and CAMPBELL COUNTY EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT COORDINATOR, DAVID KING

Case Heading (S-09-0007)
Case Number:S-09-0007Case Docketed On:01/08/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Code of Civil Procedure (Title 1)
Short Title:WILLIAM P. RICE v. COLLINS COMMUNICATION, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, CAMPBELL COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, CAMPBELL COUNTY SHERIFF, WILLIAM POWNALL, GILLETTE/WRIGHT/CAMPBELL COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION JOINT POWERS BOARD, and CAMPBELL COUNTY EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT COORDINATOR, DAVID KING
Full Title:WILLIAM P. RICE, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. COLLINS COMMUNICATION, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, COMMUNICATION TECHNOLOGIES, INC., a Wyoming Corporation, CAMPBELL COUNTY BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, CAMPBELL COUNTY SHERIFF, WILLIAM POWNALL, GILLETTE/WRIGHT/CAMPBELL COUNTY FIRE PROTECTION JOINT POWERS BOARD, and CAMPBELL COUNTY EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT COORDINATOR, DAVID KING, Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam P. RiceJeffrey Allen Tennyson
Heather Noble
AppelleeCollins Communication, Inc., a Wyoming corporationStuart R. Day
Ryan Justin Schwartz
AppelleeCommunication Technologies, Inc., a Wyoming corporationJames Corey Worthen
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Campbell County, WyomingJudith A. W. Studer
AppelleeCampbell County SheriffJudith A. W. Studer
AppelleeGillette/Wright/Campbell County Fire Protection Joint Powers BoardTom C. Toner
AppelleeCampbell County Emergency Management CoordinatorJudith A. W. Studer

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Governmental Claims, Negligence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 109
Citation:236 P3d 1009

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
01/08/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
01/08/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
01/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/20/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/03/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Gillette/Wright/Campbell County Fire Protection Joint Powers BoardEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/08/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appelees Campbell County Board of County Commissioners, Campbell County Sheriff William Pownall, and Campbell County Emergency Management Coordinator David King; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/09/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/09/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Communication Technologies, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee Collins Communication, Inc.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
04/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply brief of appellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/28/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/04/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcript.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/04/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Ryan J. Schwartz for Collins Communication, Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tom Toner for appellees Gillette/Wright Campbell Co. Fire Protection Joint Powers Board.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Judith Studer for appellees Campbell Co. Bd of Co. Commr's, Campbell Co. Sheriff and Campbell Co. Emergency Management Coordinator.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Roger E. Shumate for appellee Communication Technologies, Inc.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/28/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jeffrey A. Tennyson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/16/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Heather Noble and Jeffrey Tennyson, argument by Mr. Tennyson for appellant; Stuart R. Day, Ryan Schwartz, Roger Shumate, Judith Studer, Tom Toner, argument by Messrs. Schwartz, Shumate, and Toner, and Ms. Studer for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/16/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
04/19/2010Event - Phone Call. Received call from Mr. Worthen indicating that Roger Shumate is deceased.EventPhone CallFinal
08/04/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/19/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
08/23/2010Event - Received copies of Petition for Rehearing, requested signed originalEventPhone CallFinal
08/25/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing (Original received)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/07/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/07/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/07/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/10/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/9/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal