judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SALAISCOOPER VS. DISTRICT COURT

Case Information: 38296
Short Caption:SALAISCOOPER VS. DISTRICT COURTCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 38165
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172746Classification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Cert/Man/Pro
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:10/17/2001 at 9:00 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:10/17/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/10/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from William B. Terry-check no. 002190.
08/10/2001Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ. 01-13571
08/13/2001Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No. 002190 returned to William B.Terry in the amount of $200.00 (criminal matter - no fee required).
08/13/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Provide Proof of Service. Due date: 10 days (District Judge).
08/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. The real party in interest, on behalf of respondents, shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to file an answer, including authorities, against issuance of the requested writ. 01-13801
08/22/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of petition on Judge Bonaventure. 01-14221
09/06/2001Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. State's Opposition to Petition for Writ of Certiorari, or in the alternative, for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. 01-15029
09/17/2001MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Motion for Leave to File Response to the State's Opposition to Petition for Writ of Certiorari, or in the Alternaive for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. 01-15643
09/18/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Scheduling Oral Argument. Having reviewed the petition and the answer filed herein, this court ha concluded that oral argument before the en banc court is warranted. The clerk of this court shall schedule this matter for argument on this court's October 2001 en banc oral argument calendar. The oral argument shall be limited to 30 minutes. 01-15719
09/19/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on October 17, 2001, at 9:00 a.m. (En Banc)
09/24/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. to file Response, filed September 17, 2001. Petitioner shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file and serve a reply to the answer to the petition. 01-16070
10/01/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
10/04/2001MotionFiled Reply to Response. Petitioner's Response to State's Opposition to Petition of Certiorari or in the Alternative for Writ of Prohibition or Mandamus. 01-16697
10/17/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. Before the En Banc Court. En Banc
11/15/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Petition denied." Before the Court En Banc. Per Curiam. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 72. En Banc. 01-19045
12/12/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-19506
12/12/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.