judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01133-CV
05-89-01133-CV
09/19/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Ross, Leroy
Texas One Partnership d/b/a Ewing Estates Apartments
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/06/1997Record RetentionRetain
03/14/1991Mandate Issued
03/14/1991Mandate Issued
02/28/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
01/25/1991Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
11/06/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/06/1990MattConv
10/22/1990MattConv
09/05/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
08/30/1990Letter Filed
08/15/1990Response to Motion
08/06/1990En Banc Review
08/06/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
07/25/1990Mot-Ext to File Rehear DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/23/1990Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
07/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/06/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/04/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/02/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
05/02/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
04/25/1990Supplemental Brief Filed
04/18/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
04/16/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
04/10/1990Submitted
04/10/1990Submission
04/10/1990Submission
04/10/1990Submitted
02/23/1990MattConv
01/30/1990Letter Filed
11/16/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/14/1989Brief Filed
11/14/1989Case ready to be set
11/14/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/14/1989Case ready to be set
10/19/1989Brief Filed
10/16/1989MattConv
10/11/1989Collection letter on Filing Fee
09/25/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/19/1989Transcript Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/18/1989Appeal Bond Filed
05/22/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/14/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
160th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Mark L. Whittington
89-7124-H