judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-01132-CV
05-89-01132-CV
09/19/1989
Contract
Avery Mays Construction Co.
Industrial Indemnity Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
11/06/1997Record RetentionDestroy
07/24/1990Mandate Issued
07/24/1990Mandate Issued
05/31/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
05/18/1990Response to Motion
05/11/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/26/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/26/1990Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
03/28/1990Submission
03/28/1990Submitted
03/28/1990Submission
03/28/1990Submitted
01/31/1990MattConv
11/13/1989Brief Filed
11/13/1989Case ready to be set
11/13/1989Case ready to be set
10/19/1989Brief Filed
09/26/1989MattConv
09/19/1989Transcript Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/08/1989Appeal Bond Filed
06/15/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
191st Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable David Kress Brooks
87-17268-J