judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-89-00234-CV
02-89-00234-CV
09/19/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Green Tree Acceptance, Inc.
Holmes, Tom
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/13/1991Mandate Issued
05/08/1991Writ DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
03/29/1991Writ Filed
02/27/1991Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
01/31/1991Motion for Rehearing Filed
01/16/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/03/1990Submitted
04/03/1990Submission
02/16/1990Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/16/1990Motion Filed
02/09/1990Brief Filed
12/20/1989Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyMotion or Writ Denied
12/08/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/08/1989Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
12/01/1989Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
11/15/1989Brief Filed
10/16/1989Exhibits Filed
10/16/1989No Description Available.
10/16/1989Submission
10/11/1989No Description Available.
10/11/1989No Description Available.
09/19/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
09/19/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/13/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Holmes, TomAppellee
Woodgate HomesAppellant
Green Tree Acceptance Inc.Appellant
Trial Court Information
348th District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Michael Schattman
-106829-87