judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5813
B-5813
02/12/1976
Petition for Writ of Mandamus
JOHN L. FASHING AND ENRIQUE H. PENA
EL PASO COUNTY DEMOCRATIC EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE OF EL PASO COUNTY, TEXAS RAYMOND CABALLERO, CHAIRMAN, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
03/09/1976Supplemental Brief filedAmicus Curiae
03/02/1976Supplemental Brief filedRelator
02/27/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
02/17/1976Petition for Writ of Mandamus filedRelator
02/12/1976Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/10/1976Opinion issued
03/09/1976Supplemental Brief filed
03/02/1976Supplemental Brief filed
02/27/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
02/19/1976Motion to re-set submission date filed.Filing granted
02/17/1976Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed
02/12/1976Brief in Support of Petition
02/12/1976Motion/leave to file petition for writ of mandamusFiling granted
02/12/1976Response to Motion filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John L. Hill, Attorney General and Mark W. White, Jr., Secretary of StateAmicus Curiae
El Paso County Democratic Executive Committee of El Paso County, Texas Raymond Caballero, Chairman, et al.Respondent
John L. Fashing and Enrique H. PenaRelator
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information