judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5817
B-5817
02/13/1976
Application for Writ of Error
HOUSTON GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
ROBERT TEAGUE, SECOND INJURY FUND
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/04/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/29/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/10/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
02/13/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/11/1976Response to Motion filed
05/05/1976Response to Motion filed
05/04/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/29/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/10/1976Response to Petition
02/13/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/13/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Houston General Insurance CompanyPetitioner
S. Tom Morris, Gibson, Ochsner, Adkins, Harlan, and HankinsAmicus Curiae
SECOND INJURY FUNDRespondent
Robert TeagueRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information