judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5814
B-5814
02/13/1976
Application for Writ of Error
W. SALE LEWIS, SAVINGS AND LOAN COMMISSIONER OF TEXAS, W. SALE LEWIS SAVINGS AND LOAN COMMISSIONER, ET AL.
JACKSONVILLE BUILDING AND LOAN ASSOCIATION, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/04/1976Appendix FiledRespondent
05/04/1976Post submission brief filedRespondent
04/27/1976Post submission brief filedPetitioner
03/03/1976Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
03/01/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
02/13/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/10/1976Response to Motion filed
07/21/1976Opinion issued
05/04/1976Appendix Filed
05/04/1976Post submission brief filed
04/27/1976Post submission brief filed
03/10/1976Document received (See Remarks)
03/10/1976Document received (See Remarks)
03/10/1976Document received (See Remarks)
03/03/1976Miscellaneous MotionFiling granted
03/03/1976Amicus Curiae Brief received
03/01/1976Response to Petition
02/13/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
02/13/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
W. Sale Lewis Savings and Loan Commissioner, et al.Petitioner
W. Sale Lewis, Savings and Loan Commissioner of TexasPetitioner
Tyler Savings and Loan Association, Tyler, Texas and Hidalgo Savings and Loan Association, Hidalgo, TexasAmicus Curiae
Jacksonville Building and Loan Association, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information