judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MACON (DRAKETONIAL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38286
Short Caption:MACON (DRAKETONIAL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C172449Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/08/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/08/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-13431
08/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from counsel for appellant: 20 days from the date of this order. 01-14297
10/02/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-16532
10/30/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-16635
10/30/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/09/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 2, 2001. 01-16635