judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAM HENRY FORBES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0278)
Case Number:S-08-0278Case Docketed On:12/23/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Criminal Procedure (Title 7)
Short Title:WILLIAM HENRY FORBES v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WILLIAM HENRY FORBES, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWilliam Henry ForbesDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Eric Alan Johnson
Christopher J. King
Justin Ashkhan Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Probation, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2009 WY 146
Citation:220 P.3d 510

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/23/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA attachement receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
12/23/2008Order - Sanction - notice of appeal attachmentOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
12/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/08/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
02/09/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/10/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/25/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/25/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Christopher J. King, Student Intern, to appear on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
03/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and approval for Christopher J. King, Student Intern, to appear on behalf of appellee.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/08/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/10/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/13/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric A. Johnson and Christopher J. King, Student Intern, for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/24/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, three volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2009Motion - Oral argument - vacateMotionOral argument - vacateFinal
05/11/2009Event - Hardcopy received - motion to vacate oral argument.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2009Order - Vacating setting for oral argumentOrderVacating setting for oral argumentFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/29/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Johnson for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Consent and Approval - Justin Daraie for appellee.Notice-IncomingConsent and ApprovalFinal
06/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Consent and ApprovalEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin Daraie, Student Intern for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/18/2009Correspondence - Incoming. Letter from counsel for appellant regarding oral argument recording.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
06/18/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Leda Pojman, Senior Assistant Attorney General and Justin Daraie, Student Intern, argument by Mr. Daraie for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/18/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/19/2009Correspondence - Outgoing. Response to letter re oral argument recording.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
12/01/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Burke writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/17/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/17/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/21/2009Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/18/09.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal