judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ROY S. YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1469
Short Caption:ROY S. YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD3339-10Filed Date:11/22/2010

Opening Event Date:11/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/04/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:12/07/2011
Argued/Submitted:06/14/2012
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:09/10/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantRoy S. Young, Jr.YPro SeN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
James A. PetkunYN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/22/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (84 pgs/Tape - 10/27/10 proc.)
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (139 pgs/Tape - 10/28/10 proc.)(w/CD)
01/04/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/10/2011RECORD INDEX
01/10/2011RECORD COPIES
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 90 days
02/25/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 16, 2011. (By: JAC)
05/16/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo)
06/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 15, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
08/12/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant)Granted
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until November 14, 2011
10/07/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/07/2011FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
10/20/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief - until December 7, 2011 (Appellee)Granted
11/15/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's moton for an extension of time to file the brief until December 7, 2011
12/07/2011FiledBrief (Appellee)
12/07/2011FiledBriefing Completed
01/31/2012FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring
02/08/2012FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
05/01/2012FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
05/31/2012FiledMotion for leave to file reply brief (Appellant)Granted
06/13/2012FiledOrder Granting aplt's motion to file reply brief.
06/13/2012FiledReply Brief (Appellant)
06/14/2012FiledArgued before Judges Fisher, Blackburne-Rigsby, Farrell
08/16/2012FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Fisher and Blackburne-Rigsby, Associate Judges, and Farrell, Senior Judge.)
08/23/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
09/10/2012FiledMandate