judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5792
B-5792
02/04/1976
Application for Writ of Error
RODNEY D. BOBBITT, M.D. AND HOSPITAL CONSULTANTS, INC.
TEDD CROW, M.D.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/09/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
03/22/1976Amended PetitionPetitioner
03/22/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
02/04/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/09/1976Response to Petition
03/22/1976Amended Petition
03/22/1976Response to Petition
02/17/1976Motion for Extension of Time filedFiling granted
02/10/1976Motion for Extension of Time to File ResponseFiling granted
02/04/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/04/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Tedd Crow, M.D.Respondent
Rodney D. Bobbitt, M.D. and Hospital Consultants, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information