judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MUHSEN HADDAD V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1470
Short Caption:MUHSEN HADDAD V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD4762-10Filed Date:11/24/2010

Opening Event Date:11/24/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/20/2011
Argued/Submitted:10/25/2011
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/09/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMuhsen Haddad N
Joel DuboffYN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Nicholas P. ColemanNY
Kathleen A. Connolly YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/24/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
11/30/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF SENTENCE PENDING EXPEDITED APPEAL. ****CONSTRUED AS MOTION FOR RELEASE LW
12/01/2010TMC - appellant's EMERGENCY appeal - oppo
12/02/2010APPELLEE'S OPPOSITION - to aplt's motion for stay of execution of sentence pending expedited appeal
12/03/2010 ORDERED that APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR RELEASE IS DENIED. See DC App. R. 9: DC Code 23-1325(c)(2001). It is *****MORE*****
12/03/2010 F/ORDERED that appellant shall W/N 30 DAYS from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the SRT available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13 (a). (KROBFA) (cb)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (73 pgs/Tape - 8/23/10 proc.)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (123 pgs/Tape - 8/25/10 proc.)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (26 pgs/Tape - 8/26/10 proc.)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #4 (11 pgs/Tape - 8/30/10 proc.)(w/CD)(CORRECTED COPY)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #5 (22 pgs/Tape - 11/4/10 proc.)
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #6 (24 pgs/Tape - 11/24/10 proc.)
01/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/05/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rts filed with court)dfe
01/10/2011RECORD INDEX
01/10/2011RECORD COPIES
01/11/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JJ)
02/07/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (93pgs/Tape) 8/24/10 proc.
02/15/2011APLT MOTION to supplement and correct record. no oppo
03/24/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
03/24/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx (joint appendix)dfe
04/14/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 20, 2011 (no oppo)
04/29/2011ORDER DENY APLT MO FOR LV TO SUPPLEMENT and correct the record as moot. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall file appellant's brief and joint appendix. It is FURTHERO ORDERED that the motion of appellee for an extension of time within which to file the brief is granted and the brief shall be filed on or before May 20, 2011. (By: ETW)
04/29/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/29/2011APPENDIX - joint
05/20/2011APPELLEE'S BRIEF
05/20/2011BRIEFS COMPLETED
05/27/2011FiledFinal Screening - Summary
09/01/2011FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
10/25/2011FiledSubmitted To Blackburne-Rigsby,Oberly,Schwelb
11/18/2011FiledAffirmed (MOJ) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Oberly, Associate Judges, and Schwelb, Senior Judge.)
12/09/2011FiledMandate