judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MACON (DRAKETONIAL) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38287
Short Caption:MACON (DRAKETONIAL) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 37863 , 40017 , 47875 , 55044 , 55662 , 55735
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C169019Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/08/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
08/08/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-13433
08/23/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from counsel for appellant: 20 days from the date of this order. 01-14298
09/28/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML 01-16416
11/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 28, 2001, this court filed an order dismissing this appeal. On October 18, 2001, this court received a proper person petition for rehearing. Appellant is represented by counsel and has not been granted permission to file documents in this matter in proper person. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, the proper person petition for rehearing received on October 18, 2001. 01-18418
11/05/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to appellant Draketonial Macon. Returned unfiled, the original proper person Motion for Reconsideration on Appeal, received October 19, 2001.
11/05/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to attorney Paul E. Wommer. Returned unfiled, the original Fast Track Statement, received August 27, 2001, with a copy of the Order Dismissing Appeal filed September 28, 2001.
11/21/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-19550
11/21/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 28 2001. 01-19550