judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RICHARD JAMES GARZA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-08-0279)
Case Number:S-08-0279Case Docketed On:12/23/2008
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:RICHARD JAMES GARZA v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:RICHARD JAMES GARZA, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRichard GarzaDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Sentencing, Evidence, Trial - Post-trial Motions
Opinion Number:2010 WY 64
Citation:231 P.3d 884

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
12/23/2008Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
12/23/2008Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
12/23/2008Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/05/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
02/06/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/06/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
03/11/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/12/2009Notice-Incoming - Errata to brief of appellant.Notice-IncomingErrataFinal
03/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/12/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant Eratta SheetEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/22/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/23/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/12/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/15/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Kirk Morgan for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/20/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Exhibits; Volume VI, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/20/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/17/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Kirk Morgan, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/17/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/19/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
06/04/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
06/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
06/04/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
06/08/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 6/7/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal