judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-5796
B-5796
02/09/1976
Application for Writ of Error
JOHN MARIE PRESTON, ET AL.
JOSEPH W. JAGOE, III, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/26/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/01/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/24/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
02/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/12/1976Response to Motion filed
04/26/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/01/1976Reply to Response
02/24/1976Response to Petition
02/09/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
02/09/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
John Marie Preston, et al.Petitioner
Joseph W. Jagoe, III, et al.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information