judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00742-CR
14-89-00742-CR
08/08/1989
Burglary
Peavy, John Otis
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/16/1991Case stored
01/07/1991Mandate Issued
01/07/1991Mandate Issued
12/21/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
12/06/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/21/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
05/02/1990Submitted
05/02/1990Submission
05/02/1990Submitted
04/04/1990Submission
03/12/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/12/1990Case ready to be set
03/12/1990Case ready to be set
02/14/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/25/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/15/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/11/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/20/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/19/1989No description available.
11/24/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
11/15/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/06/1989No description available.
10/02/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/28/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/20/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/07/1989No description available.
08/31/1989Transcript FILED
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/08/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
05/09/1989Motion for new trial FILED
05/04/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/16/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasMary Lou Keel
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantH. William Johnson
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
Honorable ALLEN L. STILLEY
500,819
60 yrs. TDC