judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00743-CR
14-89-00743-CR
08/08/1989
Other Felony
Hedspetch, Lukreshia A/K/A Giddens, Lukreshia
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/04/1990Case stored
11/21/1990Mandate Issued
11/21/1990Mandate Issued
11/06/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/10/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
08/14/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
08/03/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/05/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
06/21/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/17/1990Submitted
01/17/1990Submission
01/17/1990Submitted
12/19/1989Submission
11/10/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/10/1989Case ready to be set
11/10/1989Case ready to be set
11/09/1989Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
10/31/1989Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
10/05/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/21/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
09/21/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
09/15/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
09/07/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
09/05/1989Transcript FILED
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/17/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/07/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/04/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. Robert L. Hodge
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
420,283
10 yrs. TDC