judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00299-CR
13-89-00299-CR
08/08/1989
Other Felony
Texas, The State of
Taylor, James Winford
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/06/1991Higher Court DecisionReversed and Remanded
07/26/1990Cite for opinions
06/20/1990Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Granted
04/26/1990Court of Crim. Appeals Number
04/23/1990Petition for Discretionary Review sent to S.Ct.
04/05/1990Petition for Review
03/26/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
03/08/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/13/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
01/24/1990Panel change on case on SMIS or SMIT
12/21/1989Submitted
12/21/1989Submission
11/28/1989Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
11/17/1989Submission
10/26/1989Brief Filed
10/26/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/24/1989Brief Filed
10/24/1989Case ready to be set
10/24/1989ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
10/16/1989Affidavit Filed
10/04/1989Statement of Facts Filed
10/04/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
10/04/1989Statement of Facts Received
10/03/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/31/1989Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/30/1989Address Change
08/22/1989Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/22/1989Affidavit Filed
08/22/1989Due date for record to be filed
08/22/1989Transcript Filed
08/08/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/06/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
105th District Court
Nueces
Honorable J. Manuel Banales
89-CR-1193-D