judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-89-00298-CR
13-89-00298-CR
08/08/1989
Other Felony
Cheek, Homer Wade
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/15/1990Mandate Issued
08/13/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
07/17/1990ADVISORY - tickler as to event to come
07/09/1990Letter sent
07/03/1990Letter sent
06/29/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/18/1990Submitted
01/18/1990Submission
01/10/1990Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
12/20/1989Submission
11/06/1989Brief Filed
10/12/1989Mot ext time Sup SFACTS DispMotion or Writ Granted
10/12/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/10/1989Brief Filed
10/10/1989Brief received.
10/10/1989Case ready to be set
09/26/1989Motion for extension of time to file supplemental
09/26/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/26/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
09/26/1989Supplemental Statement of Facts Received
09/26/1989Affidavit Filed
08/28/1989Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
08/28/1989Due date for record to be filed
08/28/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/23/1989Transcript Filed
08/08/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/15/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
105th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Eric Gailen Brown
89-CR-998-D
7 yrs tdc