judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00734-CR
14-89-00734-CR
08/08/1989
Other Drug Possession
Meads, Jeffrey Shawn
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/09/1989Mandate Issued
11/09/1989Mtn.dismiss DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STAGRANTED
11/09/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
11/09/1989Opinion issuedDISMISSED
11/09/1989Mandate Issued
11/08/1989Submitted
11/08/1989Submission
11/08/1989Submitted
11/02/1989Order Entered
11/02/1989Order withdrawn
10/27/1989Mtn.Dismiss FILED-ANT,APE,APP,COURTS,JOINT,STA
10/13/1989Order Entered
09/07/1989No description available.
08/08/1989Transcript FILED
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/01/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
07/07/1989Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/09/1989Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasBill R. Turner
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantJim W. James
Trial Court Information
361st District Court
Brazos
Honorable CAROLYN L. RUFFINO
18,686-361
10 yrs. probation