judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00738-CV
14-89-00738-CV
08/08/1989
Miscellaneous civil
Wilson, William Lee
Braeuer, Harry L. and Hearn, C. David
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/13/1990Case stored
11/07/1990Mandate Issued
11/07/1990Mandate Issued
10/23/1990Writ of Error DISPOSEDDENIED
07/12/1990Writ of Error FILED
06/21/1990Writ of Error FILED
05/24/1990Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
05/17/1990Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehear.DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
05/17/1990Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
05/15/1990Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
05/04/1990Ext.time file Mtn.for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,APP
05/04/1990Motion for rehearing RECEIVED - ANT,APE,PRO SE
04/20/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
04/05/1990Ext.time file suppl.brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
04/05/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
04/05/1990Supplement brief FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,REL,RES,STA
04/05/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/27/1990Submitted
03/27/1990Submitted
03/27/1990Submission
03/27/1990Submitted
03/26/1990Ext.time file supple.brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP
03/26/1990Supplement brief RECEIVED-ANT,APE
03/06/1990Submission
10/12/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STADENIED
10/06/1989Response to Motion FILED-ANT,APE,APP,RES,STA
10/05/1989Opposition filed
09/29/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
09/28/1989Mtn.Lv. oral argument DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STAGRANTED
09/13/1989Mtn.Lv. oral argument FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,STA
09/05/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
09/05/1989Case ready to be set
09/05/1989Case ready to be set
08/28/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/28/1989Case ready to be set
08/08/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/08/1989Transcript FILED
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
06/22/1989Judgment signed by trial court judge
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/13/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantHon. Steve Chudleigh
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeOtto D. Hewitt, III
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. James R. Ansell
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantEvelyn T. Ailts Derrington
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppelleeHon. Randall E. Butler
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellee
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationAppellantJohn S. Powell III
Trial Court Information
334th District Court
Harris
Honorable RUSSELL T. LLOYD
84-02483