judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROTHENHAUSLER VS. RIO PROPERTIES

Case Information: 38270
Short Caption:ROTHENHAUSLER VS. RIO PROPERTIESCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A392818Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/27/2001 / Combs, E.SP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/03/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Greg Beber, Esq.--check no. 444.
08/03/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-13147
08/08/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Complete set of district court minutes. Due Date: 10 days
08/20/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-14112
08/27/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Leslie Combs, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/27/2001Docketing StatementFiled Response to Docketing Statement. (Includes respondent's request to dismiss appeal.) 01-14419
10/22/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-17737
11/07/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 30 days from the date of this order. The preparation of transcripts and briefing schedule in this appeal shall remain suspended pending further order of this court. 01-18577
12/10/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. 01-20725
01/10/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Richard Segerblom in the place and stead of Gayle Nathan as counsel for Appellant. 02-00768
01/15/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order Resolving Motion or Stipulation. We conclude that we will be able to decide the preemption issue without deciding any issues relevant to the pending breach of contract and unjust enrichment claims. We deny the motion to dismiss. The parties were unable to settle this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 02-01018
01/22/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Richard Segerblom as counsel for Carol Lyn Rothenhausler in the place and stead of Gayle Nathan. 02-01431
01/31/2002Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 02-02084
05/09/2002MotionFiled Stipulation and Order. Brief due: May 29, 2002. 02-08153
05/31/2002MotionFiled Stipulation. 02-09556
06/17/2002MotionFiled Stipulation. (Third Request). 02-10494
06/19/2002Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. The stipulations filed on May 31, 2002 and June 17, 2002, are treated as joint motions for extensions of time. The motions are granted. Appellant shall have until July 12, 2002, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. 02-10605
07/29/2002MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 02-12986
08/21/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). NNP/CLK 02-14254
08/21/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.