judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WARREN WAYNE RATHBUN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-10-0245)
Case Number:S-10-0245Case Docketed On:11/17/2010
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:WARREN WAYNE RATHBUN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:WARREN WAYNE RATHBUN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantWarren Wayne RathbunDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
Justin A. Daraie

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law -Sentencing
Opinion Number:2011 WY 116
Citation:257 P.3d 29

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/17/2010Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
11/17/2010Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
11/17/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
01/03/2011Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellant.MotionExtension of time - briefFinal
01/03/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
01/04/2011Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
02/17/2011Motion - Supplement the recordMotionSupplement the recordFinal
02/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - motion to supplement the record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
02/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/14/2011Order - Granting Motion to Supplement RecordOrderGrantFinal
03/31/2011Record - Supplemental record on appeal from Circuit Court filed in the District CourtRecordSupplemental record on appealFinal
04/04/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/12/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Olson for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/20/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Justin Daraie for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/25/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/05/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, seven volumes. Volumes 1-2, Original Papers; Volume 3, Jury Instructions and Verdict; Volume 4, Transcripts; Volumes 5-6, Exhibits; Volume 7, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/10/2011Event - Other - contacted counsel for appellant and requested transcriptions of the circuit court proceedings that have been filed as a supplement to the record. Counsel agreed to file transcripts as soon as they are complete.EventOtherFinal
05/18/2011Record - Other - received requested transcript of circuit court proceedings, including initial appearance, arraignment, preliminary hearing and sentencing.RecordOtherFinal
05/24/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Olson, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Justin Ashkhan Daraie, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
05/24/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
05/27/2011Record - Other - received transcript of preliminary hearing on November 23, 2009 in Circuit Court Case CR-2009-1617.RecordOtherFinal
08/08/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
08/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
08/24/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
08/24/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
08/24/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/29/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 8/20/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal