judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ADRIAN TRUMAINE KEA V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1453
Short Caption:ADRIAN TRUMAINE KEA V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD17592-10Filed Date:11/22/2010

Opening Event Date:11/22/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/03/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/08/2012

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Shane N. WallerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
11/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/03/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Charles Fitzpatrick, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/03/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Charles Fitzpatrick, Esquire
12/08/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
01/03/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (158 pgs/Tape - 11/17/10 proc.)(w/CD)
01/03/2011RECORD COMPLETED
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/04/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (Restitution information filed 11/17/10)*****SEALED******
01/05/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
02/14/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo 5/13/11
03/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 13, 2011. (By: JAC)
05/12/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until August 15, 2011 (no oppo)
06/03/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 15, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
08/15/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief until Oct.17,2011 (Appellant)Granted
08/30/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for an extension of time to file the brief and limited appendix until October 17 ,2011
10/17/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
10/17/2011FiledAppendix (attached to brief) (Appellant)
11/21/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
11/22/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/15/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
02/15/2012FiledAffirmed
02/21/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
03/08/2012FiledMandate