judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

NELSON D. EDGERLY, FLOYD FORSE, LARRY STEFFLEN, J. M. ALLEN AND H. A. ALLEN, ET AL. v. TEXACO, INC.

Case: B-1320
B-1320
01/14/1969
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
NELSON D. EDGERLY, FLOYD FORSE, LARRY STEFFLEN, J. M. ALLEN AND H. A. ALLEN, ET AL.
TEXACO, INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/08/1969Supplement to ResponseRespondent
04/18/1969Brief in Support of PetitionRelator
04/17/1969Response to PetitionRespondent
03/10/1969Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
03/10/1969Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
02/18/1969Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
01/20/1969Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
01/14/1969Exhibits in case/cause filedRelator
01/14/1969Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedRelator
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/28/1969Opinion issued
05/08/1969Supplement to Response
04/18/1969Brief in Support of Petition
04/17/1969Response to Petition
03/10/1969Exhibits in case/cause filed
03/10/1969Exhibits in case/cause filed
02/18/1969Exhibits in case/cause filed
01/20/1969Exhibits in case/cause filed
01/16/1969Bond
01/14/1969Exhibits in case/cause filed
01/14/1969Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filedFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Nelson D. Edgerly, Floyd Forse, Larry Stefflen, J. M. Allen and H. A. Allen, et al.Relator
Texaco, Inc.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information