judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00384-CR
04-89-00384-CR
08/09/1989
All Misdemeanors
Texas, The State of
Pacheco, Luis
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/19/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
01/29/1990Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
01/25/1990Mandate Issued
01/25/1990Mandate Issued
11/30/1989Motion for Dismissal DisposedDismissed
11/29/1989Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
11/29/1989Opinion issuedDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
11/03/1989Motion for Dismissal Filed
10/10/1989Brief Filed
09/11/1989No Description Available.
08/25/1989No Description Available.
08/11/1989Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/10/1989Motion Filed
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/01/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/21/1989Appealable Order signed in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/25/1990Case StoredCase stored
01/25/2015RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 9
Bexar
Honorable Bonnie Reed
420308
6 months prob, $100 fine