judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00942-CR
05-89-00942-CR
08/09/1989
All Misdemeanors
Yates, Violet Windle
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/02/2020Order enteredDestroy
10/10/1989Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/10/1989Mandate Issued
10/10/1989Motion to Expedite MandateMotion or Writ Granted
10/10/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
10/10/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
10/10/1989Mandate Issued
10/10/1989Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedWithdrawn
09/01/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
08/16/1989Transcript Filed
08/16/1989Transcript Tendered
08/09/1989Motion for Leave to File
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/02/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 5
Dallas
Honorable Thomas C Fuller
MA87-46303-E
30 days Jail & $2,000 Fine