judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00740-CR
14-89-00740-CR
08/08/1989
Robbery
Butler, Alvin
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/16/1991Case stored
12/06/1990Mandate Issued
12/06/1990Mandate Issued
11/21/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
10/24/1990Petition for Discretionary Review DISPOSEDREFUSED
09/27/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
08/15/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
07/19/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/19/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
07/18/1990Submitted
07/18/1990Submission
07/18/1990Submitted
12/28/1989Mtn.supplement record DISPOSED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STADENIED
12/18/1989Mtn.to supplement record FILED-ANT,APE,PRO SE,STA
12/14/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/14/1989Case ready to be set
12/14/1989Case ready to be set
11/28/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/21/1989Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
11/16/1989Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
11/16/1989No description available.
11/02/1989Supplemental transcript RECEIVED - ANT,APE,STA
10/19/1989Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
10/09/1989Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
10/05/1989No description available.
10/02/1989Transcript FILED
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/03/1989Date of Sentence
08/03/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/16/1991Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasTimothy G. Taft
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantBrian W. Wice
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationPRO SE
Trial Court Information
337th District Court
Harris
512,142
30 yrs. TDC