judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00741-CR
14-89-00741-CR
08/08/1989
All Misdemeanors
Jackson, Troy Demetrious
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/23/1990Case stored
04/17/1990Mandate Issued
04/17/1990Mandate Issued
04/02/1990No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
03/16/1990No motion for rehearing FILED
03/01/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
03/01/1990Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/28/1990Submitted
02/28/1990Submission
02/28/1990Submitted
02/15/1990Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/25/1990Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/16/1990Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
12/20/1989Brf.FILED-Argu.waive-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
11/21/1989Record Filed (Both records FILED)
09/29/1989Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
08/25/1989Motion for new trial FILED
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/27/1989Date of Sentence
07/27/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/23/1990Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHon. Jeffrey V. Tzetzo
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasJohn Brook
Trial Court Information
Co Crim Ct at Law No 8
Harris
Honorable NELL A. RICHARDSON
8922763
160 dys.credit time-served