judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-89-00744-CR
14-89-00744-CR
08/08/1989
Theft
Tafarroji, Khalilollah
The State of Texas
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/16/1992Case stored
12/24/1991Mandate Issued
12/24/1991Mandate Issued
12/09/1991No Petition for Discretionary Review FILED
11/22/1991No motion for rehearing FILED
11/07/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/07/1991Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/30/1991Submitted
10/30/1991Submission
10/30/1991Submitted
09/30/1991Submission
08/19/1991Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/19/1991Case ready to be set
08/19/1991Case ready to be set
07/25/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
07/17/1991Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
06/07/1991Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/16/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
05/09/1991Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
04/11/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
04/08/1991Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
03/14/1991Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
03/08/1991Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
02/07/1991Motion to abate DISPOSED - APP, STADENIED
02/07/1991Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STADENIED
01/29/1991Hearing Record FILED
01/29/1991Motion to abate FILED - APP, STA
01/29/1991Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
10/02/1990No description available.
08/30/1990Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
08/22/1990Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
06/14/1990Motion to abate DISPOSED - APP, STAGRANTED
06/14/1990Motion to substitute attorney DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
06/14/1990Order Entered
06/12/1990Hearing Record FILED
06/11/1990Motion to abate FILED - APP, STA
06/11/1990Motion to substitute attorney FILED-ANT,APE
05/10/1990No description available.
11/10/1989Order Entered
10/09/1989No description available.
10/04/1989Transcript FILED
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/07/1989Date of Sentence
08/07/1989Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/16/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantHenry L. Burkholder, III
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
180th District Court
Harris
522,545
5yrs.TDC prob.&$2500.fine