judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00950-CV
05-89-00950-CV
08/08/1989
Contract
Paean Enterprises Co., Ltd & John C. Lin, et al
Peter Wai-Ching Chin
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/18/2001Order EnteredDestroy
04/18/2001Record Pickup
10/16/1997Record RetentionDestroy
03/01/1991Mandate Issued
03/01/1991Mandate Issued
02/15/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.Refused - No Reversible Error
07/05/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
07/05/1990MattConv
06/08/1990Response to Motion
06/05/1990Corrected Judgment Entered
06/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/05/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/01/1990Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
05/11/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
04/27/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/14/1990Submission
02/14/1990Submitted
12/21/1989MattConv
10/10/1989Exhibits Filed
10/06/1989Brief Filed
10/06/1989Case ready to be set
10/06/1989Case ready to be set
10/02/1989Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1989Motion for Leave to File
09/13/1989Brief Filed
08/14/1989MattConv
08/14/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/08/1989Transcript Filed
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/14/1989Appeal Bond Filed
04/21/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/18/2001Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
95th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Joe B Brown
87-3392-D