judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00947-CR
05-89-00947-CR
08/08/1989
Other Drug Possession
Edwards, Johnnie Lynn
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/13/2020Order enteredDestroy
02/01/2001Record RetentionDestroy
12/11/1991Mandate Issued
12/11/1991Mandate Issued
11/21/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
08/02/1991Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
07/29/1991Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Granted
06/25/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/25/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/25/1991Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/04/1990Submission
12/04/1990Submitted
12/04/1990Submission
12/04/1990Submitted
10/10/1990MattConv
07/12/1990Case ready to be set
07/12/1990Brief Filed
07/12/1990Case ready to be set
06/27/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/17/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/16/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/16/1990Brief Filed
04/10/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/06/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/29/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/28/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/26/1990Letter Sent by the Court
02/20/1990Exhibits Filed
02/20/1990Statement of Facts Filed
12/22/1989Findings of Fact & Conclusion of Law Filed
12/14/1989Supplemental Transcript filed
10/20/1989Order Entered
09/28/1989Letter Sent by the Court
09/12/1989Transcript Filed
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/21/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/19/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/13/2020Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
F89-78152-V
5 yrs TDC Probated