judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00948-CR
05-89-00948-CR
08/08/1989
Burglary
Clark, Edward Ross
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/01/2001Record RetentionRetain
03/21/1997Letter Sent by the Court
02/14/1997Letter Received
02/12/1997Letter issued by the court
01/24/1997Letter issued by the court
01/11/1996Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/31/1995Motion to Withdraw Record
08/08/1990Mandate Issued
08/08/1990Mandate Issued
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/07/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/06/1990Submitted
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submission
06/06/1990Submitted
04/11/1990MattConv
03/06/1990Brief Filed
03/06/1990Case ready to be set
03/06/1990Case ready to be set
02/26/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/23/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/11/1989Brief Filed
11/10/1989Transcript Filed
08/31/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/14/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/14/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/08/1990Case StoredDestroy 25 yrs after date of final disposition
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Verla S Holland
F89-81478-V
20 yrs TDC