judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-89-00816-CV
01-89-00816-CV
08/08/1989
Divorce
Ruiz, Joan; In the matter of the Marriage of:
Ruiz, Hiram
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/14/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/14/1992Mandate issued - criminal or civil
04/09/1992Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
04/09/1992Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
06/27/1991Order entered
05/29/1991No description available.
05/20/1991Letter of inquiry received, usually from an inmate.
04/02/1991Brief due for retained counsel
04/26/1990Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel disposedGrant motion
04/11/1990Motion to substitute counsel
03/15/1990Motion to abate appeal disposedGrant motion
03/15/1990Motion to dismiss appeal disposedMotion or Writ Denied (inactivated by Hebert 2-8-06)
12/27/1989Response filed to a motion or to a Court order
12/14/1989Motion to dismiss appeal
11/22/1989Motion to abate appeal
10/05/1989Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
09/22/1989Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
09/13/1989Notice of dismissal
08/29/1989Filing fee paid
08/08/1989Transcript filed
08/08/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/03/1989Appeal bond filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/14/1992Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppelleeJolene Wilson-Glah
StateAppelleeHon. David Zavoda
StateAppellantGerald B. Scheve
Trial Court Information
310th District Court
Harris
88-33079