judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8946
C-8946
08/09/1989
See former TRAP 130(D)
GENE A. FOREMAN
AETNA CASUALTY & SURETY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/02/1990Notice of Appeal filedPetitionerTO U.S. SUPREME COURT
11/09/1989Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
03/02/1990Notice of Appeal filedTO U.S. SUPREME COURT
12/01/1989Record returned to Court of AppealsREHEARING OVERRULED
11/29/1989Motion for Rehearing - DisposedOverruled
11/16/1989Motion for Rehearing forwarded
11/09/1989Motion for Rehearing
10/25/1989Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
09/28/1989Case forwarded to Court
09/08/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
09/08/1989No description available.
08/11/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling granted
08/09/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
12/01/1989Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
Dismissed [duplicate 1]
Rule 90, 06-08-89
14th Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
133rd District Court
Harris
Honorable Lamar McCorkle
83-34162