judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: C-8945
C-8945
08/09/1989
See former TRAP 130(D)
THOMAS M. MOLONEY
FIDELMA M. CREAVIN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
10/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
10/06/1989Reply to ResponseRespondent12 COPIES OF COURT OF APPEALS BRIEF
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
05/31/2019Case File from MicroficheThese electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file.
02/26/1990Record returned to Court of AppealsNO REHEARING FILED
01/24/1990Application for Writ of Error - DisposedDenied
10/19/1989Case forwarded to Court
10/19/1989No description available.
10/12/1989Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/06/1989Reply to Response12 COPIES OF COURT OF APPEALS BRIEF
08/09/1989Extension of time to file app writ err disposed ofFiling granted
08/09/1989Extension of time to file app writ err filedBEHALF/THOMAS M. MOLONEY
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
02/26/1990Case StoredCase stored.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Court of Appeals Information:
13-88-00267-CV
Reversed & Remanded
773 Sw2d 698, 06-08-89
13th Court of Appeals
Honorable Norman L. Utter
Trial Court Information
117th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Robert M. Blackmon
87-690-B