judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00953-CR
05-89-00953-CR
08/09/1989
Other Drug Possession
Cooper, Curtis Allen
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/01/2001Record RetentionRetain
05/10/1991Mandate Issued
05/10/1991Mandate Issued
05/01/1991Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
05/01/1991Case Returned from Higher Ct.
12/27/1990Petition for Discretionary Review FiledRefused
12/13/1990Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Denied
12/11/1990Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Denied
11/30/1990Motion for Relief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
11/19/1990Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
11/19/1990Motion for Relief Filed
11/14/1990Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Granted
10/22/1990Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
10/22/1990Opinion issuedModified/Reformed and Affirmed
10/02/1990Submission
10/02/1990Submitted
10/02/1990Submission
10/02/1990Submitted
09/28/1990Motion for Extension to File Response - DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1990Brief Filed
09/26/1990Motion for Extension to File Response Filed
09/25/1990Mot.-Ext. File Sup Brief DispMotion or Writ Granted
09/21/1990Mot. for Ext. File Sup. Brief
08/20/1990MattConv
04/02/1990Brief Filed
04/02/1990Case ready to be set
04/02/1990Case ready to be set
03/23/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/22/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/09/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/08/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/06/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/12/1990Brief Filed
01/08/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/05/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/13/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/08/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/10/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/07/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/09/1989Statement of Facts Filed
09/27/1989Transcript Filed
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
08/08/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
08/08/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/10/1991Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 3
Dallas
Honorable Mark S Tolle
F89-82405-RJ
30 yrs TDC