judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-89-00952-CR
05-89-00952-CR
08/09/1989
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Moore, Keith
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/2001Letter Sent by the Court
03/19/2001Letter Received
02/01/2001Record RetentionRetain
05/19/1994Case Returned from Higher Ct.
04/28/1994Letter filed
04/28/1994Motion for Leave to FileMotion or Writ Granted
04/07/1994Motion to withdraw record disposed
03/24/1994Motion to withdraw record filed
08/27/1990Mandate Issued
08/27/1990Mandate Issued
06/22/1990Motion for extension of time to file petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsMotion or Writ Granted
06/20/1990Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCA
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/24/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
05/23/1990Submission
05/23/1990Submitted
05/21/1990Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/18/1990Motion for Postponement
03/12/1990MattConv
01/31/1990Brief Filed
01/31/1990Case ready to be set
01/31/1990Case ready to be set
01/05/1990Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/03/1990Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/05/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/04/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/08/1989Brief Filed
10/27/1989Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
10/26/1989Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/29/1989Transcript Filed
09/25/1989Statement of Facts Filed
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/28/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
07/27/1989Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/27/1990Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable F. H. Entz
F88-86302-UM
Life, TDC