judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 04-89-00382-CR
04-89-00382-CR
08/09/1989
Assault or Attempted Murder
Salinas, Charlie
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/16/1991Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
04/05/1991Mandate received by the trial court
03/08/1991Mandate Issued
03/08/1991Mandate Issued
03/04/1991Case Returned from Higher Court
01/30/1991Higher Court DecisionRefused
12/18/1990No New Event but Update in Calendar
12/13/1990Case Forwarded to Higher Court
11/21/1990Petition for Review Filed
10/24/1990Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/11/1990Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/26/1990Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/12/1990Submitted
09/12/1990Submission
09/12/1990Submitted
07/24/1990Submission
05/31/1990Brief Filed
05/31/1990Case ready to be set
05/31/1990Case ready to be set
05/15/1990Response to Motion Filed
05/07/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/01/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
02/23/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief DisposedMotion Granted in Part
02/22/1990Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed
01/29/1990Brief Filed
12/29/1989No Description Available.
11/08/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/03/1989No Description Available.
09/12/1989No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
09/06/1989No Description Available.Abeyance
09/01/1989No Description Available.
08/16/1989No Description Available.
08/09/1989Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
07/18/1989Notice of Appeal Filed
05/18/1989Motion for New Trial Filed
04/19/1989Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/08/1991Case StoredCase stored
03/18/2016RetentionDate criminal case will be destroyed (25 years after mandate)
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
218th Judicial District Court
Frio
Honorable Olin Bernard Strauss
F88-10-130CR
4 years TDC